This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 12:22:52 (UTC).

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7609

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

VILLANUEVA ZIOLA NOVELO

VILLANUEVA MARIO RUIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

10/6/2021: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sale)

10/7/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sale)

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sale)

8/30/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Sale)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

5/6/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

5/6/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF SCOTT ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

4/7/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF SCOTT ROBINSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL MEDIONI IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 585, 1033 A

4/7/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL MEDIONI IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 585, 1033 A

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/7/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Judgment - Judgment JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT ( FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE )

4/16/2021: Judgment - Judgment JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT ( FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE )

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

12/14/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/8/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/8/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/8/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Sale); Issued by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketWrit - Return ( ); CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant); Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Sale); Issued by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT ( FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE ): As To Parties changed from MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant), ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant) to ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant), MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJudgment JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER DEFAULT ( FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE ); Signed and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant); ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION against Defendant Mario Ruiz Villanueva, an individual and Trustee of the 2004 Villanueva Family Trust Dated October 6,2004 and Defendant Ziola Novelo Villanueva, an individual and Trustee of the 2004 Villanueva Family Trust Dated October 6,2004 on the Complaint filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 09/08/2020 for the principal amount of $4,602.09, attorney fees of $1,975.00, and costs of $965.00 for a total of $7,542.09, joint and several.; Other: See court order for terms and conditions of the judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant); Service Date: 09/25/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/25/2020; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant); ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant); ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO RUIZ VILLANUEVA (Defendant); ZIOLA NOVELO VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M