This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2021 at 09:00:03 (UTC).

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS KALENE PARKER

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against KALENE PARKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0380

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

PARKER KALENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment by Court

8/3/2021: Judgment - Judgment by Court

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

8/3/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION AND SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1312

7/20/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION AND SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1312

Order (name extension) - Decision Following Non-Jury Trial

6/18/2021: Order (name extension) - Decision Following Non-Jury Trial

Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order - Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order to Judge Borenstein, Dept. 2, SSC,OTR forthwith

5/7/2021: Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order - Limited Jurisdiction Trial Transfer Order to Judge Borenstein, Dept. 2, SSC,OTR forthwith

Affidavit (name extension) - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) as to Judge Mark Borenstein

5/7/2021: Affidavit (name extension) - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) as to Judge Mark Borenstein

Witness List - Witness List

5/5/2021: Witness List - Witness List

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

5/5/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

2/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Appearance - Notice of Appearance

2/10/2020: Notice of Appearance - Notice of Appearance

Answer - Answer

2/10/2020: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/10/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint - Complaint

11/8/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/8/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/8/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Hearing09/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Court; Signed and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: KALENE PARKER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION against Defendant KALENE PARKER on the Complaint filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 11/08/2019 for the principal amount of $10,904.16 for a total of $10,904.16.; Other: As to the second and fourth causes of action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant KALENE PARKER against Plaintiff CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on the Complaint filed by CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 11/08/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Other: As to the first and third causes of action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment by Court: Name Extension: - Court Finding - After Court Trial - 08/03/2021 entered for Plaintiff CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION against Defendant KALENE PARKER.Court Finding - After Court Trial - 08/03/2021 entered for Defendant KALENE PARKER against Plaintiff CANYON OAKS ... As To Parties changed from KALENE PARKER (Defendant) to KALENE PARKER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Attorney Fees and costs (Plaintiff's motion) scheduled for 09/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Attorney Fees and costs (Plaintiff's motion) scheduled for 08/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION AND SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1312; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: KALENE PARKER (Defendant); Service Date: 01/11/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: KALENE PARKER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: KALENE PARKER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: KALENE PARKER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON OAKS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M