This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:38 (UTC).

CANYON CREST PROPERTIES INC VS PHILLIPS, MYRA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 CANYON CREST PROPERTIES INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PHILLIPS, MYRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0274

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON CREST PROPERTIES INC

Defendant

PHILLIPS MYRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REAL, VINCENT

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS, MYRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2014
  • LOST WRIT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED,ISSUED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY * LOST WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/05/13, 01:30 PM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DEFAULT ENTERED FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less