Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2020 at 04:12:36 (UTC).

CANHUI WANG VS FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 CANHUI WANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0215

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG CANHUI

San Gabriel, CA 91776

Defendants

FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTEMATIVE MEDICINE L.P.

FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P.

FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P. DBA ALHAMBRA MEDICAL UNIVERSITY

55 S. Raymond Ave #105

Alhambra, CA 91801

 

Court Documents

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

4/3/2019: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

3/26/2019: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

3/26/2019: Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

3/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/22/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/22/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

2/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/6/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/19/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/9/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketJudgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Canhui Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/28/2019 ; Status Date changed from 02/22/2019 to 03/28/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketNotice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims); Issued by: Clerk; As to: Canhui Wang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketRequest to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/22/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Canhui Wang against Defendant Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. DBA Alhambra Medical University on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Canhui Wang on 01/09/2019 for the principal amount of $3,555.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $3,670.00.; Other: Although there appears to be a procedure for plaintiffs to challenge any denial of their application by CAMTC (deadline noted is March 12, 2019), it does not appear that any of the plaintiffs have pursued this option. Moreover, while defendant pointed out that the CAMT certification is voluntary, the plaintiff's established that they suffered some harm as a result of CAMT not accepting only transcripts from defendant's school as sufficient proof of 'adequate education. (Business and professions Code, section 4600 et seq.) The defendant's name is amended to include dba Alhambra Medical University.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 02/19/2019; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Canhui Wang (Plaintiff); As to: Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/15/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Fenwu University of Altemative Medicine L.P. to Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Docket** Case Name changed from CANHUI WANG vs FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTEMATIVE MEDICINE L.P. to CANHUI WANG vs FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Canhui Wang (Plaintiff); As to: Fenwu University of Altemative Medicine L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P. DBA ALHAMBRA MEDICAL UNIVERSITY is a litigant