This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 03:13:12 (UTC).

CANH NGUYEN VS JOSE LUIS VELASQUEZ LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 CANH NGUYEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE LUIS VELASQUEZ LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1563

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN CANH

Defendant

LOPEZ JOSE LUIS VELASQUEZ

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court], VIA: S.A.S.E.

9/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court], VIA: S.A.S.E.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • Hearing12/11/2020 at 03:00 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Canh Nguyen (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Luis Velasquez Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Jose Luis Velasquez Lopez (Defendant) to Jose Luis Velasquez Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court], VIA: S.A.S.E. Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 12/11/2020 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less