This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 01:25:36 (UTC).

CANDELARIO DE JESUS GUANDIQUE VS IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 CANDELARIO DE JESUS GUANDIQUE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3390

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUANDIQUE CANDELARIO DE JESUS

Defendants

M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE INC.

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

Defendant Attorney

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/16/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/16/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/16/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Answer - Answer

6/4/2020: Answer - Answer

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, Request for Stay, and Request for Costs

8/11/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, Request for Stay, and Request for Costs

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Nima Heydari in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action Pending Arbitration Results

8/11/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Nima Heydari in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Action Pending Arbitration Results

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/11/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/25/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Continued Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/8/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Continued Motion to Compel Arbitration

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Settlement

1/28/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Settlement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Candelario De Jesus Guandique on 04/16/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Candelario De Jesus Guandique as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAddress for Kasra Sadr (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of Continued Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Candelario De Jesus Guandique (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/07/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Candelario De Jesus Guandique (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Candelario De Jesus Guandique (Plaintiff); As to: M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/30/2020; Service Cost: 106.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Candelario De Jesus Guandique (Plaintiff); As to: In-House Auto Finance, Inc. (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Candelario De Jesus Guandique (Plaintiff); As to: In-House Auto Finance, Inc. (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Candelario De Jesus Guandique (Plaintiff); As to: In-House Auto Finance, Inc. (Defendant); M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC03390    Hearing Date: February 04, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., February 4, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Guandique v. In House Auto Finance, Inc. COMPL. FILED: 04-16-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC03390 DISC. C/O: 09-14-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 09-29-21

TRIAL DATE: 10-14-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, PETITION FOR COURT TO PICK ARBITRATION FORUM, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND REQUEST FOR COSTS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Candelario De Jesus Guandique

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

(CCP § 1281.2, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

To allow the parties time to conclude their settlement efforts, Plaintiff’s Motion is CONTINUED TO APRIL 7, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of February 2, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of February 2, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On April 16, 2020, Plaintiff Candelario De Jesus Guandique (“Plaintiff”) filed an action against Defendants In-House Finance, Inc. (“In-House”), M&N Financing Corporation (“M&N”), Hudson Insurance Company (“Hudson”).

On August 11, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, Request for Stay, and Request for Costs (the “Motion”). No opposition was filed.

On January 28, 2021, Plaintiff filed a conditional Notice of Settlement of the Entire Case. In light of this, the Court CONTINUES this hearing to allow the parties time to conclude their settlement efforts.

  1. Conclusion & Order

To allow the parties time to conclude their settlement efforts, Plaintiff’s Motion is CONTINUED TO APRIL 7, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN-HOUSE AUTO FINANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where M&N FINANCING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN