This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 10:26:40 (UTC).

CAMERON PROPERTIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MARK KHACHATOORIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 CAMERON PROPERTIES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARK KHACHATOORIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0221

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMERON PROPERTIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

KHACHATOORIAN MARK

KHACHATOORIAN ANNA CHRISTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAKARI RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/30/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/30/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

1/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/31/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Mark Khachatoorian)

1/31/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Mark Khachatoorian)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Anna Christi Khachatoorian)

1/31/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Anna Christi Khachatoorian)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/12/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

3/12/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/12/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Khachatoorian (Defendant); Anna Christi Khachatoorian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 62.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Khachatoorian (Defendant); Anna Christi Khachatoorian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 03/12/2020 entered for Plaintiff Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation against Defendant Mark Khachatoorian; Defendant Anna Christi Khachatoorian. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation against Defendant Mark Khachatoorian and Defendant Anna Christi Khachatoorian on the Complaint filed by Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation on 01/30/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 661 Claraday Street, Apartment 8, Glendora, CA 91740 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Mark Khachatoorian (Defendant); Anna Christi Khachatoorian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Khachatoorian (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/08/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Christi Khachatoorian (Defendant); Service Date: 02/08/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/08/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Anna Christi Khachatoorian; Mark Khachatoorian; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation on 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Donna Hollingsworth in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Khachatoorian (Defendant); Anna Christi Khachatoorian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Khachatoorian (Defendant); Anna Christi Khachatoorian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cameron Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Khachatoorian (Defendant); Anna Christi Khachatoorian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cameron Properties, INC is a litigant