This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 09:19:18 (UTC).

CAMACHO AUTO SALES VS MARK P. GONZALES

Case Summary

On 10/13/2016 CAMACHO AUTO SALES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARK P GONZALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH A. ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0785

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMACHO AUTO SALES

38713 Tierra Subida, #200-313

Palmdale, CA 93551

Defendants

GONZALES MARK P.

Lancaster, CA 93534

GARNER CASSANDRA M.

Lancaster, CA 93536

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/15/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/30/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 11/30/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/30/2016: Minute Order of 11/30/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/30/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/30/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/13/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

[Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment]

11/13/2017: [Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment]

Unknown

11/13/2017: Unknown

(Court Order)

12/14/2017: (Court Order)

Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/14/2017

12/14/2017: Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/14/2017

(Los Angeles)

12/18/2017: (Los Angeles)

Unknown

12/14/2017: Unknown

Unknown

3/21/2018: Unknown

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 270.55; Interest Credits: 21.00; Principal Credits: 929.90; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 03/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Order on Declaration of Default in Payments; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mark P. Gonzales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment; Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales (Plaintiff); As to: Mark P. Gonzales (Defendant); Interest: 245.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/30/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2016 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 11/30/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Camacho Auto Sales against Defendant Cassandra M. Garner; Defendant Mark P. Gonzales on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Camacho Auto Sales on 10/13/2016 for the principal amount of $1,999.99, interest of $305.59, and costs of $150.00 for a total of $2,455.58, joint and several.; Payments are to be made at the rate of $200.00 per month, beginning on 12/20/2016 and on 20th of each month thereafter until paid in full. If any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immediately.; Other: **Judgment to be payable without interest so long as payments are made without default of 7 days or more. Upon default of 7 days or more entire principal balance plus interest accrued from the date of judgment to be immediately due and payable**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales (Plaintiff); As to: Cassandra M. Garner (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/01/2016; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales (Plaintiff); As to: Mark P. Gonzales (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AV-2016-0001092 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2016 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales (Plaintiff); As to: Mark P. Gonzales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Randolph A. Rogers at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A15

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMACHO AUTO SALES INC. is a litigant