Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 17:53:29 (UTC).

CAMACHO AUTO SALES VS FLOR MANZANILLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2017 CAMACHO AUTO SALES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLOR MANZANILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0088

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMACHO AUTO SALES

38713 Tierra Subida Ste. #200-313

Palmdale, CA 93551

Defendants

MANZANILLA FLOR

Palmdale, CA 93552

TOME ALEX

Palmdale, CA 93552

 

Court Documents

[Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment]

8/29/2017: [Declaration of Default in Payment of Judgment]

Unknown

4/18/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/18/2018: Unknown

Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...) of 12/20/2017

12/20/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...) of 12/20/2017

(Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)

12/20/2017: (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/27/2017: Unknown

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/15/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/15/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/21/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Unknown

9/14/2017: Unknown

[Order on Declaration of Default in Payments]

9/26/2017: [Order on Declaration of Default in Payments]

Unknown

8/28/2017: Unknown

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: CAMACHO AUTO SALES (Plaintiff); As to: ALEX TOME (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/18/2018 ; Status Date changed from 03/15/2017 to 04/18/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/18/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/18/2018 to 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/18/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/18/2018 to 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/18/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/18/2018 to 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/18/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/18/2018 to 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: CAMACHO AUTO SALES (Plaintiff); As to: FLOR MANZANILLA (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/18/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/18/2018 to 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/18/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/18/2018 to 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/18/2018 ; Status Date changed from 04/18/2018 to 04/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff CAMACHO AUTO SALES against Defendant ALEX TOME; Defendant FLOR MANZANILLA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by CAMACHO AUTO SALES on 01/12/2017 for the principal amount of $258.78 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $258.78.; Payments are to be made at the rate of $50.00 per month, beginning on 04/20/2017 and on 20th of each month thereafter until paid in full. If any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immediately.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 03/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: CAMACHO AUTO SALES (Plaintiff); As to: ALEX TOME (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAMACHO AUTO SALES (Plaintiff); As to: FLOR MANZANILLA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/19/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0001826 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CAMACHO AUTO SALES (Plaintiff); As to: FLOR MANZANILLA (Defendant); ALEX TOME (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Brian C. Yep at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMACHO AUTO SALES INC. is a litigant