This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 11:10:57 (UTC).

CAMACHO AUTO SALES, INC. VS JAMES PALENCIA

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 CAMACHO AUTO SALES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES PALENCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0948

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMACHO AUTO SALES INC.

Defendant

PALENCIA JAMES

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/18/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/18/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Document changed from Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) to Proof of Service by Substituted Service; As To Parties: James Palencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties: James Palencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: James Palencia (Defendant); Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 95.00; Mailing Date: 10/24/2020; Proof of Mailing Date: 10/24/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 12/17/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. against Defendant James Palencia on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. on 10/13/2020 for the principal amount of $2,289.42 and costs of $145.00 for a total of $2,434.42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Status Date changed from 12/18/2020 to 12/17/2020; As To Parties: James Palencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/17/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Camacho Auto Sales, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: James Palencia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMACHO AUTO SALES INC. is a litigant