This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2019 at 06:57:06 (UTC).

CALLEIA, LAURA VS IKEA HOLDING US INC

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 CALLEIA, LAURA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IKEA HOLDING US INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3987

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALLEIA LAURA

Defendant

IKEA HOLDING US INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZOLA, WEGMAN & ASSOCIATES APC

ZOLA WEGMAN & ASSOCIATES APC

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

(name extension) - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

11/29/2016: (name extension) - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

Complaint - Other Premise Liability

11/10/2016: Complaint - Other Premise Liability

Summons

11/10/2016: Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/10/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 11/12/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER PREMISE LIABILITY Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less