This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2020 at 17:16:43 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA VALLEY PROPERTIES, LLC. VS YELIN BERLFEIN

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 CALIFORNIA VALLEY PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YELIN BERLFEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0890

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA VALLEY PROPERTIES LLC.

Defendant

BERLFEIN YELIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING ALLEN R.

Defendant Attorney

ZARGAROF RONEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

11/7/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

11/7/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/7/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

11/8/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Yelin Berlfein)

11/8/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Yelin Berlfein)

Answer - Answer

11/15/2019: Answer - Answer

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

11/18/2019: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

11/18/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/26/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER ON TRANSFER OF CASE TO DEPARTMENT ONE BY JUDGE GA...)

12/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER ON TRANSFER OF CASE TO DEPARTMENT ONE BY JUDGE GA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/20/2019

12/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/20/2019

Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits - Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

12/20/2019: Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits - Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/20/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOther - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) as to Judge Aenlle-Rocha; Filed by: California Valley Properties, LLC. (Plaintiff); Yelin Berlfein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 10:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 92

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial Transfer Order to Judge Aenlle-Rocha, Dept. 92, Central, OTR forthwith; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: California Valley Properties, LLC. (Plaintiff); Yelin Berlfein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant Yelin Berlfein against Plaintiff California Valley Properties, LLC. on the Complaint filed by California Valley Proerties, LLC. on 11/07/2019 for a total of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketStipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (COURT ORDER ON TRANSFER OF CASE TO DEPARTMENT ONE BY JUDGE GA...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket** Case Name changed from CALIFORNIA VALLEY PROERTIES, LLC. vs YELIN BERLFEIN to CALIFORNIA VALLEY PROPERTIES, LLC. vs YELIN BERLFEIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- California Valley Properties, LLC. (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from California Valley Proerties, LLC. to California Valley Properties, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/20/2019 at 09:50 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Yelin Berlfein (Defendant); As to: California Valley Proerties, LLC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 11/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: California Valley Proerties, LLC. (Plaintiff); As to: Yelin Berlfein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: California Valley Proerties, LLC. (Plaintiff); As to: Yelin Berlfein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: California Valley Proerties, LLC. (Plaintiff); As to: Yelin Berlfein (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less