This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 18:43:25 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA FIRST LEASING CORPORATION VS BETTY T. YEE

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 a Other - Declaratory Judgment case was filed by CALIFORNIA FIRST LEASING CORPORATION against BETTY T YEE in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5461

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA FIRST LEASING CORPORATION

Defendant

YEE BETTY T.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/21/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/9/2018: Answer

Request for Dismissal

8/22/2018: Request for Dismissal

Summons - on Complaint

12/19/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/19/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: California FIrst Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Betty T. Yee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: California FIrst Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: California FIrst Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Betty T. Yee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: California FIrst Leasing Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

omekagggamuuo\owqmmawrouc

. . e ‘ SX > .

CALIFORNIA FIRST LEASING CORPORATION

Office of Corporate Counsel | Priscilla H. Douglas (St. Bar No. 117918)

Angela L. Walsh (St. Bar No. 169141) FILED 28 Executive Park Superior Court of Californig Irvine, CA 92614 County of Los Angeles Telephone: (949) 255-0500 Facsimile: (9499 255-5320 OEC 19 2017 Email: pdouglas@cinbe.com Sherrs

awalsh@cfnbc.com rri R, Carter, Executive o1y Clerk of Cour Attorneys for Plaintiff By, California First Leasing Corporation Judi Larg s Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CALIFORNIA FIRST LEASING CASE NO.: 7STLC 05461 CORPORATION, a California corporation, COMPLAINT FOR: Plaintiff, - | v (1) REFUND UNDER CAL. CODE

CIV. PROC. SECTIONS 1540 AND

(2) UNJUST ENRICHMENT

over 10,000

Filing date: December 19,2017

Defendants,

BY FAX

Plaintiff California First Leasing Corporation (“CFLC™) alleges against Defendants Betty T. Yee in her official capacity as Controller of the State of California and DOES 1 through 10 (“Defendants™) as follows:

OVERVIEW

1. California’s Unclaimed Property Law, California Code of Civil Procedure §§ 1300 et seq. (the “UPL”), is intended to reunite property owners with their lost property. The UPL is not intended to, and may not be used by Defendants to, allow the State of California

(“State”) to alter the nature of a party’s contractual obligation to another or to take custody of