Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 01:11:07 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA DEPOSITION REPORTERS VS MARVIN L MATHIS

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 CALIFORNIA DEPOSITION REPORTERS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARVIN L MATHIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1012

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA DEPOSITION REPORTERS

599 S Barranca Ave, Penthouse Suite

Covina, CA 91723

Defendants

MATHIS MARVIN L

MATHIS MARVIN L.

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

8/10/2018: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/16/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/2/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2018

8/2/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/2/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/2/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/22/2018

5/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/22/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/22/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/22/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 01/22/2019 ; Status Date changed from 08/02/2018 to 01/22/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: California Deposition Reporters (Plaintiff); As to: Marvin L. Mathis (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- RETURNED MAIL: As To Parties: Marvin L. Mathis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Marvin L. Mathis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: California Deposition Reporters (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 08/02/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff California Deposition Reporters against Defendant Marvin L. Mathis on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by California Deposition Reporters on 03/09/2018 for the principal amount of $1,270.73 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $1,340.73.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: California Deposition Reporters (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/22/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/02/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: California Deposition Reporters (Plaintiff); As to: Marvin L. Mathis (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/16/18; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Marvin L. Mathis (Defendant): Middle Name changed from l to L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: California Deposition Reporters (Plaintiff); As to: Marvin l Mathis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPOSITION REPORTERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant