This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 06:22:25 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC VS NOLASCO, PAULA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NOLASCO, PAULA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5596

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

NOLASCO EPIFANIO

NOLASCO PAULA AKA NOLASCO PAULA G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - FRANKLIN J. LOVE

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

LOVE FRANKLIN J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/17/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/17/2017: Complaint

Summons

3/17/2017: Summons

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/3/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/18/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

5/18/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/24/2017: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/8/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/8/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

11/1/2017: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order - (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)

4/30/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 04/30/2018

4/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 04/30/2018

Request for Dismissal

5/8/2018: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2018
  • Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 06/28/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/28/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/28/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/28/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 04/30/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/28/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • Default entered as to PAULA NOLASCO; EPIFANIO NOLASCO; On the Complaint filed by CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC on 03/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: PAULA NOLASCO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CCP 170.6 FILED BY (CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS TO HONORABLE THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (NOLASCO, PAULA) AKA (NOLASCO, PAULA G) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (NOLASCO, EPIFANIO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/02/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371081. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less