This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 20:35:34 (UTC).

CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS VS S.B.R.S. INC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS filed an Other lawsuit against S B R S INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8909

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS

Defendant

S.B.R.S. INC AKA S.B.R.S.INC. AKA SBRS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIRO SCHULMAN & RABK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/15/2017: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/4/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS (Plaintiff); As to: S.B.R.S. INC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/28/2017; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/22/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 07/21/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less