This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2019 at 01:15:40 (UTC).

CAL WOOD GROUP/SERIES 1129, LL VS WEST, SCOTT BRIAN

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 CAL WOOD GROUP/SERIES 1129, LL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WEST, SCOTT BRIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6572

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAL WOOD GROUP/SERIES 1129 LLC DBA CAL WOOD GROUP/SERIES 521

Defendants

WEST SCOTT BRIAN

HARDING JODANNA M AKA HARDING JODANNA MAE AKA HARDIN JODANNA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MENKE LAW FIRM, APC - BRUCE R. MENKE

Attorney at MENKE LAW FIRM, APC

MENKE BRUCE R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 145.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PRD . PICKUP BOX UNDER 'RAPTOR'

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 24.17 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 , HON. DOUGLAS W. STERN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY BRUCE R. MENKE (X) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/11/16 , FOR (CAL WOOD GROUP/SERIES 1129, LLC) DBA (CAL WOOD GROUP/SERIES 521) , AGAINST (WEST, SCOTT BRIAN) , (HARDING, JODANNA M) AKA (HARDING, JODANNA MAE) AKA (HARDIN, JODANNA M) , PAST DUE RENT + DAILY DAMAGES $ 990.87 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 990.87 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 521 EAST 3RD STREET, #204 LONG BEACH, CA 90802 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 , HON. DOUGLAS W. STERN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY BRUCE R. MENKE (X) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 01/11/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT S12 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED REQUEST FOR ACCOMMODATIONS BY PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES AND RESPONSE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2015
  • ANSWER FILED OF (WEST, SCOTT BRIAN) , (HARDING, JODANNA M) AKA (HARDING, JODANNA MAE) AKA (HARDIN, JODANNA M) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (WEST, SCOTT BRIAN) , (HARDING, JODANNA M) AKA (HARDING, JODANNA MAE) AKA (HARDIN, JODANNA M) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • ADA ACCOMMODATION REQUESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (WEST, SCOTT BRIAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (HARDING, JODANNA M) AKA (HARDING, JODANNA MAE) AKA (HARDIN, JODANNA M) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/13/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT S12 . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PRD. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less