This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 20:32:39 (UTC).

CAL INTERPRETING & TRANSLATIONS INC. VS PROMISES RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT CENTER VI, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 CAL INTERPRETING TRANSLATIONS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROMISES RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT CENTER VI, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5072

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAL INTERPRETING & TRANSLATIONS INC.

12304 Santa Monica Boulevard #300,

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant

PROMISES RESIDENTIAL TREATMENT CENTER VI INC.

5000 E Spring Street, Suite 650,

Long Beach, CA 90815

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

4/19/2018: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/1/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/01/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/1/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/01/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/1/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/16/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/3/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/3/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/3/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

8/2/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

8/4/2017: Notice of Postponement

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Postponement]

8/4/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Postponement]

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/6/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/6/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • Updated -- Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims: Status Date changed from 04/16/2018 to 04/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by: Cal Interpreting & Translations Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Updated -- Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims: Status changed from Filed to Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/01/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 02/01/2018; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Cal Interpreting & Translations Inc. against Defendant Promises Residential Treatment Center VI, INC. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Cal Interpreting & Translations Inc. on 07/06/2017 for the principal amount of $575.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $650.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Cal Interpreting & Translations Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Promises Residential Treatment Center VI, INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/09/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Cal Interpreting & Translations Inc. (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170711E0704 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170711E0704 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/29/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cal Interpreting & Translations Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Promises Residential Treatment Center VI, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/03/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Promises Residential Treatment Center VI, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL INTERPRETING & TRANSLATIONS INC. is a litigant