This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 16:16:31 (UTC).

CACH VS MUNOZ, JUAN M

Case Summary

On 01/25/2013 CACH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MUNOZ, JUAN M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL P RAMIREZ, HOWARD L. HALM and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0500

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOWARD L. HALM

Judges

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

MUNOZ JUAN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH CHRIS D. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

1/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 01/08/2020

1/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 01/08/2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2013: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order (name extension) - to Show Cause

1/30/2013: Order (name extension) - to Show Cause

Order (name extension) - to Show Cause Hearing

1/14/2015: Order (name extension) - to Show Cause Hearing

Notice of Settlement - Conditional

1/8/2015: Notice of Settlement - Conditional

Other - (name extension) - DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY PURSUANT TO CCP 98 IN LIEU OF DIRECT TESTIMONY AND AUTHENTICATING DOCUMENTARY

7/29/2014: Other - (name extension) - DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY PURSUANT TO CCP 98 IN LIEU OF DIRECT TESTIMONY AND AUTHENTICATING DOCUMENTARY

Notice (name extension) - OF HEARING

9/22/2014: Notice (name extension) - OF HEARING

Notice (name extension) - OF HEARING

9/27/2013: Notice (name extension) - OF HEARING

Notice (name extension) - TO ATTEND TRIAL

7/29/2014: Notice (name extension) - TO ATTEND TRIAL

Minute Order

9/17/2013: Minute Order

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE FILED .

2/20/2013: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE FILED .

Motion re: (name extension) - ORDER THAT MATTERS IN REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

7/29/2013: Motion re: (name extension) - ORDER THAT MATTERS IN REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Answer

2/19/2013: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Denied

2/26/2013: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Denied

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/30/2013: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Minute Order

9/17/2014: Minute Order

Declaration (name extension) - re: Venue

1/25/2013: Declaration (name extension) - re: Venue

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CACH on 01/25/2013, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 01/08/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 01/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/08/2020; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Norwalk Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 01/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (CACH) LLC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IS VACATED, NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE SET FOR OSC TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE . MATTER SET ON 01/08/20 AT 08:30A M. IN DEPT. SEY . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing; Filed by: (CACH) LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN M MUNOZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2013
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (MUNOZ, JUAN M) AN INDIVIDUAL . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MUNOZ, JUAN M) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY PETER A. HERNANDEZ TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/31/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY PETER A. HERNANDEZ TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/31/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Filed by: (CACH) LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN M MUNOZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (CACH) LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN PAID. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Chris D. Mandarich, SB 220693; Ryan E. Vos, SB 224368; Rebecca E. Hunter, SB 271420; Nathaniel Clark, SB 276621; Jo-Anna Nieves, SB 276807

Mandarich Law Group, LLP

6301 Owensmouth Avenue, Suite 850 I

Woodland Hills, CA 91367 oy LOS ANGELES SUPER

Local: 818-264-0111 Lofpry PUPFRIOR COURT Toll Free: 877-414-0130 &,

;fi»{?;rgz? JAN 25 2013 ““{JOHN A. CLARKE, CLERK

Attorneys for Plaintiff W BY MICHELLE R. ZARATEE DEPUTY

Facsimile: 818-888-1260

,R‘sa\ ¥e

irar CRC 3.740

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES EAST DISTRICT, WEST COVINA COURTHOUSE — LIMITED JURISDICTION

CACH, LLC, ) Case No.: 1 D ) gbé ; Plaintiff, ) COMPLAINT FOR: ) VS. ) 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ) 2. COMMON COUNTS JUAN M MUNOZ, an individual; ) and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive. ) ) Defendants. ) DEMAND: $7,089.29 Plaintiff alleges:

FACTS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

1. Plaintiff is and at all times herein mentioned was, a Colorado Limited Liability Company, and assignee of original creditor, Bank of America, N.A..

2. Plaintiff is informed and believes that Defendants are individuals who currently reside within the jurisdictional boundaries of the above entitled Court. Therefore, this Court is the proper Court for trial of this action.

3. Plaintiff is unaware of the true names or capacities, whether individual, corporate, associate or otherwise of the Defendants sued herein as DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, and therefore, sues the Defendants by such fictitious names. Plaintiff will amend this Complaint to show their true names and

capacities once ascertained.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDARICH, CHRIS D