Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2019 at 08:28:11 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS EDWARD O MELENDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by CACH, LLC against EDWARD O MELENDEZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7220

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

MELENDEZ EDWARD O

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

10/4/2019: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/9/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Non Military Status

9/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Non Military Status

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Cach, LLC on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Cach, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Cach, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edward O Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Cach, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edward O Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cach, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edward O Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cach, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edward O Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Non Military Status; Filed by: Cach, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edward O Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cach, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Edward O Melendez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less