This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2023 at 12:25:11 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS DERRICK HUNTER

Case Summary

On 07/27/2017 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DERRICK HUNTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4098

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

HUNTER DERRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ LORENA O.

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS LYNDA E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/27/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/27/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint

7/27/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

7/27/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - OF VENUE

7/27/2017: Declaration (name extension) - OF VENUE

Proof of Service - No Service

10/3/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/13/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

11/2/2017: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

11/2/2017: Answer

Request for Dismissal

2/2/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

3/27/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

 

Docket Entries

02/23/2021

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2018

DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2018

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/05/2018

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2018

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2018

DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2017

DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2017

DocketUpdated -- Lynda E. Jacobs (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Unicourt to AMERICAN DEBT LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2017

DocketAddress for Lynda E. Jacobs (Attorney) clerical correction

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2017

DocketAnswer; Filed by: DERRICK HUNTER (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2017

DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: DERRICK HUNTER (Defendant); As to: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
10/03/2017

DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2017

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2017

DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2017

DocketComplaint; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DERRICK HUNTER (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2017

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2017

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2017

DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2017

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2017

DocketDeclaration OF VENUE; Filed by: CACH, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2017

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Christopher D. Mandarich SB220693 Lorena Fernandez SB283113

Lisa Herme SB283111 FILED Ryan Vos SB224368 Sugerior Court of California Christina Toroyan SB311530 ountv of Los Anaeies MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP JUL 27 2017

9200 Oakdale Avenue, Suite 601 Chatsworth, CA 91311

Local: 218.396.8086 Sherri R.C rt/er, Executive Officer/Clerk Toll Free: 855.441.5983 By%%’%% Deputy Facsimile: 818.888.1260 O

Attorneys for Plaintiff

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - LIMITED

CACH, LLC Case Nol'8

Plaintiff, COMPLAINT FOR: Vs. 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT

2. OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT DERRICK HUNTER, an individual; and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive. Defondant DEMAND: $9,909.03 Plaintiff alleges:

FACTS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

1. Plaintiff is and at all times herein mentioned, a Colorado Limited Liability Company

and assignee of AVANT, INC., and successor in interest to original creditor, WebBank.

2. Plaintiff is the only entity that purchased the debt after charge-off and its name an address 1s as follows: CACH, LLC: 6300 S. Syracuse Way #300, Centennial, CO 80111.

3. Plaintiff is a debt buyer, and is the sole owner of the debt at issue.

4. The charge-off creditor at the time of charge-off is AVANT, INC., 640 N LaSalle St. Ste. 535, Chicago, IL 60654, and the account number associated with this debt is XXX0449.

5. Plaintiff is informed and believes that Defendant(s) are individuals who currently