Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 08:05:37 (UTC).

CACH LLC VS BURLESON, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BURLESON, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6631

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

BURLESON CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NUEHEISEL LAW FIRM, P.C. - DEBORAH S. HARVEGO

Attorney at NUEHEISEL LAW FIRM, P.C.

HARVEGO DEBORAH S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/22/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

3/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • On the Complaint filed by CACH LLC on 03/29/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (CACH LLC) as to CHRISTOPHER BURLESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (CACH LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER BURLESON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: (CACH LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER BURLESON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BURLESON, CHRISTOPHER) . SERVED ON 5/07/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/13/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371107. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARVEGO, DEBORAH S