This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2017 at 21:01:09 (UTC).

BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC VS. ROJO, MARIA

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROJO, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. SCHUUR and SANFORD ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1209

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. SCHUUR

SANFORD ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC

Defendant

ROJO MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES - H.G. LONG ESQ

Attorney at H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SASE MH . RECEIPT # NOR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 53.73 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEW , HON. MICHAEL L. SCHUUR, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING LUKE DANIELS . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/25/17 , FOR (BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC) , AGAINST (ROJO, MARIA) , PAST DUE RENT $ 1612.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 1343.25 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 , COSTS $ 340.00 . TOTAL $ 3,795.25 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 9128 BURKE ST APT 114 PICO RIVERA, CA 90660 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. A WRIT OF POSSESSION MAY BE ISSUED FORTHWITH, BUT NO FINAL LOCKOUT PRIOR TO JUNE 9, 2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED TENANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROJO, MARIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . SERVICE FEE $75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (ROJO, MARIA) . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 05/10/17 AT 08:30A M IN DEPT. SEW . RECEIPT # WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (ROJO, MARIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (ROJO, MARIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NOR509405014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/02/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SEF . D.S .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE