This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2017 at 21:00:24 (UTC).

BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC VS. ESPINOZA, VICTOR

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESPINOZA, VICTOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0838

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC

Defendant

ESPINOZA VICTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES - H.G. LONG ESQ

Attorney at H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/30/17 , FOR (BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC) , AGAINST (ESPINOZA, VICTOR) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 9128 BURKE ST. APT 139 PICO RIVERA, CA 90660 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 50.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ISSUED AT THE COUNTER . RECEIPT # NOR509405006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (ESPINOZA, VICTOR) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ESPINOZA, VICTOR) . SERVICE FEE $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . SERVICE FEE $75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ESPINOZA, VICTOR) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 04/28/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SEF . JD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NOR443666006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE