This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:00:26 (UTC).

BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRP VS. ARSUAL INVESTMENTS

Case Summary

On 04/28/2015 BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ARSUAL INVESTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3074

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY

Defendant

ARSUAL INVESTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION - TERENCE R. BOGA

Attorney at A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Defendant Attorney

GRIMM & SCHOLNICK, ATTORNEYS AT LAW - ROBERT M. SCHOLNICK

Attorney at GRIMM & SCHOLNICK, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/19/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 35.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # PAS623312004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED ON AN UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT(S) (ARSUAL INVESTMENTS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT AUTHORITY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NEA , HON. WILLIAM D. DODSON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: CHAMBERS REVIEW . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. IN REVIEWING THE AMENDED PLEADING AND THE ORIGINAL, THE COURT NOTES THAT THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT SPECIFICALLY ALLEGED DAMAGES OVER $25,000 WHICH EXCEEDS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT OF THIS LIMITED JURISDICTION COURT. (SEE COMPLAINT, PAGE 2, PARAGRAPH 6. THERE IS NO REMITTITUR OR WAIVER OF DAMAGES) NEVERTHELESS, THE CASE WAS ASSIGNED A LIMITED CIVIL CASE NUMBER AND ASSIGNED TO THE LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER HUB COURT. THIS COURT LACKING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT NEA FOR CONSIDERATION OF ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • STIPULATION RE: AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # PAS285741016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • ANSWER FILED OF (ARSUAL INVESTMENTS) BY ROBERT SCHOLNICK . RECEIPT # PAS463601016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (ARSUAL INVESTMENTS) BY ROBERT M. SCHOLNICK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO ARSUAL INVESTMENTS BY LEAVING WITH NUNE BADALYAN, PERSON IN CHARGE . COSTS OF $ 80.39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 6103.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE THOSE DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THIS CASE TO A FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY KEVIN C. BRAZILE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/23/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURBANK-GLENDALE-PASADENA AIRPORT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLNICK ROBERT MARTIN