This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 08:49:39 (UTC).

BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM, INC. VS KATRINA BUTTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KATRINA BUTTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0912

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM INC.

Defendants

WILLIAMS JR. DERRICK LAMONT

BUTTS KATRINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEAN KRISTI

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

8/20/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

8/11/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Entry of Dismissal Or, In The Alternative, Judgment and Order Thereon

7/28/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation for Entry of Dismissal Or, In The Alternative, Judgment and Order Thereon

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/1/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/1/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/25/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/25/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

1/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/7/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/27/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/27/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/26/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/26/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/26/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Katrina Butts (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Name Extension: blank; As To Parties changed from Katrina Butts (Defendant) to Katrina Butts (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. against Defendant Katrina Butts on the Complaint filed by Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. on 11/26/2019 for damages of $9,582.86, interest of $315.05, costs of $645.00, and other $-542.91 for a total of $10,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketJudgment Judgment By Court; Signed and Filed by: Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Katrina Butts (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Judgment By Court: As To Parties changed from Katrina Butts (Defendant) to Katrina Butts (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment/Dismissal as to Defendant Katrina Butts scheduled for 09/01/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. on 11/26/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Derrick Lamont Williams, Jr. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/12/2020; Service Cost: 320.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Katrina Butts (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/15/2020; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Katrina Butts (Defendant); Derrick Lamont Williams, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Katrina Butts (Defendant); Derrick Lamont Williams, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Budget Rent A Car system, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Katrina Butts (Defendant); Derrick Lamont Williams, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC10912    Hearing Date: January 28, 2021    Dept: 26

Budget Rent a Car System, Inc. v. Butts, et al.

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Budget Rent a Car System, Inc.’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions is GRANTED AGAINST DEFENDANT DERRICK LAMONT WILLIAMS, JR. DEFENDANT WILLIAMS IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $435.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On April 16, 2020, Plaintiff Budget Rent a Car System, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Derrick Lamont Williams, Jr. (“Defendant Williams”). (Motion, Dean Decl., Exh. B.) The Requests for Admission were re-served on Defendant Williams on June 3, 2020. (Id. at Exh. C.) On June 17, 2020, Defendant Williams served incomplete and unverified responses to the Requests for Admission. (Id. at ¶10.)

As of the filing of this Motion, Plaintiff has not received verified responses to the discovery requests propounded on Defendant Williams. (Id. at ¶12.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on July 27, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Therefore, Plaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission admitted. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Sanctions are required under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive under a lodestar calculation. Sanctions are granted against Defendant Williams in the amount of $435.00, based on one hour of attorney time billed at $375.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Motion, Dean Decl., ¶14.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff Budget Rent a Car System, Inc.’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions is GRANTED AGAINST DEFENDANT DERRICK LAMONT WILLIAMS, JR. DEFENDANT WILLIAMS IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $435.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUDGET RENT A CAR SYSTEM INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant