This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 01:19:02 (UTC).

BRYTNI SARPY, ET AL. VS 938 ORANGE GROVE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 BRYTNI SARPY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against 938 ORANGE GROVE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5175

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDWARDS ISABELLE

SARPY BRYTNI

Defendants

RST ASSOCIATES LP

938 ORANGE GROVE LLC

R. SCOTT TUCKER & ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GRAYSON STEPHEN PRESTON

 

Court Documents

Abandonment of Appeal (Small Claims) - Abandonment of Appeal (Small Claims)

11/8/2021: Abandonment of Appeal (Small Claims) - Abandonment of Appeal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 09/23/2021

9/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 09/23/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

9/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

8/18/2021: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

8/18/2021: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/23/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/23/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

3/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

3/2/2021: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/18/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/18/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

5/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

5/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 05/19/2021

5/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 05/19/2021

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/19/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal (Small Claims); Filed by: 938 Orange Grove, LLC (Defendant); R. Scott Tucker & Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 11/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 11/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 03:15 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/09/2021 10:00 AM at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 03:15 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Stephen Preston Grayson (Attorney); As to: 938 Orange Grove, LLC (Defendant); R. Scott Tucker & Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 03:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/23/2021 03:15 PM at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 09/23/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Brytni Sarpy (Plaintiff); Isabelle Edwards (Plaintiff); As to: R. Scott Tucker & Associates, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 145.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Brytni Sarpy (Plaintiff); Isabelle Edwards (Plaintiff); As to: 938 Orange Grove, LLC (Defendant); R. Scott Tucker & Associates, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- R. Scott Tucker & Associates, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from RST Associates, LP to R. Scott Tucker & Associates, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAddress for R. Scott Tucker & Associates, LLC (Defendant) amendment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Brytni Sarpy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol: As To Parties changed from Brytni Sarpy (Plaintiff) to Brytni Sarpy (Plaintiff), Isabelle Edwards (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 03:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Brytni Sarpy (Plaintiff); Isabelle Edwards (Plaintiff); As to: 938 Orange Grove, LLC (Defendant); RST Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RST ASSOCIATES LP is a litigant

Latest cases where R. SCOTT TUCKER & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAYSON STEPHEN PRESTON