This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 21:54:13 (UTC).

BRYAN J MAIORCA, ET AL. VS SAKO'S AUTOMOTIVE

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 BRYAN J MAIORCA, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAKO'S AUTOMOTIVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WESLEY L. HSU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2429

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WESLEY L. HSU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAIORCA BRYAN J

MAIORCA JAMES S

Defendant

SAKO'S AUTOMOTIVE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021

4/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/8/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/8/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court **AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION ON 04/08/2021**

12/28/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court **AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION ON 04/08/2021**

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Sako's Automotive (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC to Sako's Automotive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket** Case Name changed from BRYAN J MAIORCA, et al. vs MITCHELL REPAIR INFORMATION COMPANY, LLC to BRYAN J MAIORCA, et al. vs SAKO'S AUTOMOTIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 03:00 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 04/08/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court **AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION ON 04/08/2021**: Name Extension: **AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION ON 04/08/2021**; As To Parties changed from Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC (Defendant) to Sako's Automotive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Sako's Automotive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Bryan J Maiorca, et al. on 12/28/2020 as follows: Defendant Sako's Automotive does not owe the plaintiffs Bryan J Maiorca; James S Maiorca any money on plaintiff's claim.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Bryan J Maiorca (Plaintiff); James S Maiorca (Plaintiff); As to: Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/01/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Bryan J Maiorca (Plaintiff); James S Maiorca (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Bryan J Maiorca (Plaintiff); James S Maiorca (Plaintiff); As to: Mitchell Repair Information Company, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wesley L. Hsu in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2021 at 03:00 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less