This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 01:14:59 (UTC).

BRUCE J GUTTMAN VS THE GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 BRUCE J GUTTMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2339

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTTMAN BRUCE J

Defendant

THE GUTTMAN FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/7/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/7/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/10/2018

8/10/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/10/2018

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/10/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/10/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

8/10/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/20/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/20/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/20/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/20/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

5/31/2018: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/16/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/2/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Bruce J Guttman on 03/02/2018 as follows: Defendant The Guttman Family Limited Partnership does not owe the plaintiff Bruce J Guttman any money on plaintiff's claim.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Guttman Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Guttman Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 11/20/2018; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Guttman Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Guttman Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Bruce J Guttman on 03/02/2018, judgment entered on 05/07/2018 is vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/10/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: The Guttman Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 05/07/2018; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Bruce J Guttman against Defendant The Guttman Family Limited Partnership on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Bruce J Guttman on 03/02/2018 for the principal amount of $708.50 and costs of $60.00 for a total of $768.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Bruce J Guttman (Plaintiff); As to: The Guttman Family Limited Partnership (Defendant); Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/11/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Bruce J Guttman (Plaintiff); As to: The Guttman Family Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/07/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less