This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 10:55:46 (UTC).

BRUCE HADASH VS COMPLETE POOL & SPA, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 BRUCE HADASH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COMPLETE POOL SPA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0891

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HADASH BRUCE

Defendant

COMPLETE POOL & SPA INC.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/02/2020

11/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/02/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL], filed 08/13/2020

8/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL], filed 08/13/2020

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL

8/13/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/19/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

6/10/2020: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/1/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/21/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/02/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by BRUCE HADASH on 02/21/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 10/19/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL], filed 08/13/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL: As To Parties: BRUCE HADASH (Plaintiff), COMPLETE POOL & SPA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/19/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BRUCE HADASH (Plaintiff); As to: COMPLETE POOL & SPA, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/30/2020; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/29/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: BRUCE HADASH (Plaintiff); As to: COMPLETE POOL & SPA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE POOL AND SPA INC is a litigant