This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 21:01:06 (UTC).

BROWN, NERI, SMITH & KHAN LLP VS C&H SPORTSWEAR INC

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 BROWN, NERI, SMITH KHAN LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C H SPORTSWEAR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2540

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN NERI SMITH & KHAN LLP

Defendants

C&H SPORTSWEAR INC

CONTRERAS ADAN CUEVA

CONTRERAS ADAN CUEVA AKA CUEVA ADAM AKA CUEVA ADAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/28/2017: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: BROWN, NERI, SMITH & KHAN LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketNOT FOUND OR NON SERVICE RETURN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/11/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 10/11/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C&H SPORTSWEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BROWN NERI SMITH & KHAN LLP is a litigant