Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 05:34:20 (UTC).

BROOKE HARMON, ET AL. VS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 BROOKE HARMON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6171

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES SCOTT

HARMON BROOKE

Defendant

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC.

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

6/29/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Benny Aviles

5/11/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Benny Aviles

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (By Fax)

4/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (By Fax)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/11/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/02/2021

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/02/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/1/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

10/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Defendant) to Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/01/2021 ; Status Date changed from 05/11/2021 to 07/01/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/01/2021 ; Status Date changed from 07/01/2021 to 07/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/01/2021 ; Status Date changed from 07/01/2021 to 07/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Brooke Harmon (Plaintiff); Scott Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Benny Aviles; Filed by: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Brooke Harmon and Plaintiff Scott Jones against Defendant Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Brooke Harmon, et al. on 10/01/2020 for the principal amount of $5,250.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $5,365.00.; Other: Civil Code Section 1950.5 violations; Unreasonable deductions from Security Deposit for tenancy of 6.3 years

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/11/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/02/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/11/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Brooke Harmon (Plaintiff); Scott Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCES AND EXCHANGE AND SUBMISSION OF EVIDENCE PROTOCOL]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Brooke Harmon (Plaintiff); Scott Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant