This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2016 at 20:25:37 (UTC).

BROADWAY CIVIC CENTER LP VS BRICE, JASON

Case Summary

On 09/28/2015 BROADWAY CIVIC CENTER LP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BRICE, JASON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2028

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROADWAY CIVIC CENTER LP

Defendant

BRICE JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING, ALLEN R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSSESSION ISSUED-RETURNED BY MAIL/VKB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED-RETURNED BY MAIL/VKB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • APPLICATION TO POST/ORDER FILED/SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • RECEIVED APPLICATION TO POST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • OSC SET 03/28/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROADWAY CIVIC CENTER L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, ALLEN R.