Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 08:10:00 (UTC).

BRIAN D MORENO VS GERALD L HARRIS

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 BRIAN D MORENO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GERALD L HARRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2291

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO BRIAN D

Defendant

HARRIS GERALD L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIOTT KELLY

SIMMS RYAN JASON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/17/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Within Firm

8/2/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Within Firm

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/20/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

5/20/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service by Sheriff's Department

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service by Sheriff's Department

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/21/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/4/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/4/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/07/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Brian D Moreno on 03/04/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Brian D Moreno as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Brian D Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Ryan Jason Simms (Attorney): First Name changed from Kelly to Ryan; Last Name changed from Elliott to Simms; Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Diederich & Associates to DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES; Middle Name: Jason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAddress for Ryan Jason Simms (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney Within Firm; Filed by: Gerald L Harris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Gerald L Harris (Defendant); As to: Brian D Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gerald L Harris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service by Sheriff's Department; Filed by: Brian D Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Gerald L Harris (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/11/19; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Brian D Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Gerald L Harris (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/10/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brian D Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Gerald L Harris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brian D Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Gerald L Harris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian D Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Gerald L Harris (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIOTT KELLY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMMS RYAN