Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2018 at 07:50:29 (UTC).

BRIAN ANDY HERNANDEZ VS ERIS LANDAVERDE GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 BRIAN ANDY HERNANDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERIS LANDAVERDE GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0019

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ BRIAN ANDY

Los Angeles, CA 90037

Defendant

LANDAVERDE GUTIERREZ ERIS

South Gate, CA 90280

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/16/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/13/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2018

2/16/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2018

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/13/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

11/13/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 02/16/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Brian Andy Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Eris Landaverde Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less