This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 10:33:35 (UTC).

BRENNAN LAW FIRM VS ANDREA GALANTE

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 BRENNAN LAW FIRM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANDREA GALANTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4635

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENNAN LAW FIRM

Defendant

GALANTE ANDREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITCH WILLIAM S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/2/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/2/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

6/2/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Brennan Law Firm (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Galante (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/07/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Andrea Galante; On the Complaint filed by Brennan Law Firm on 06/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Brennan Law Firm (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Galante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brennan Law Firm (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Galante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brennan Law Firm (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Galante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brennan Law Firm (Plaintiff); As to: Andrea Galante (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRENNAN LAW FIRM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITCH WILLIAM STANLEY