This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 06:19:55 (UTC).

BRENDA LARA-JUAREZ VS CESAR REYNA

Case Summary

On 08/11/2017 BRENDA LARA-JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CESAR REYNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0052

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

LARA-JUAREZ BRENDA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

REYNA CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASADO KELLY LAWRENCE

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNG SARA

 

Court Documents

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #5 Precluding Witnesses Not Disclosed in Discovery; Declaration of Pegah Sharifi; Proposed Order

2/6/2019: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #5 Precluding Witnesses Not Disclosed in Discovery; Declaration of Pegah Sharifi; Proposed Order

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #6 To Exclude Introduction of Evidence, Testimony or Reference to Evidence of Medical Bills in Excess of the Amount Pa

2/6/2019: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #6 To Exclude Introduction of Evidence, Testimony or Reference to Evidence of Medical Bills in Excess of the Amount Pa

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

2/6/2019: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Settlement Negotiations Between the Parties; Declaration of Pegah Sharifi; Proposed Order

2/6/2019: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Settlement Negotiations Between the Parties; Declaration of Pegah Sharifi; Proposed Order

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #3 to Preclude Introduction of Medical Expenses in the Absence of Competent Medical Testimony; Declaration of Pegah Sh

2/6/2019: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #3 to Preclude Introduction of Medical Expenses in the Absence of Competent Medical Testimony; Declaration of Pegah Sh

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #8 To Exclude Evidence of Non Economic Loss to Plaintiff Brenda Lara-Juarez; Declaration of Pegah Sharifi; Proposed Or

2/6/2019: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #8 To Exclude Evidence of Non Economic Loss to Plaintiff Brenda Lara-Juarez; Declaration of Pegah Sharifi; Proposed Or

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #7 To Exclude Evidence not Disclosed By Plaintiffs Pursuant to Defendant's c.c.p. 96 Request; Declaration of Pegah Sha

2/6/2019: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine #7 To Exclude Evidence not Disclosed By Plaintiffs Pursuant to Defendant's c.c.p. 96 Request; Declaration of Pegah Sha

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) as to Judge Tamzarian

2/11/2019: Other - (name extension) - Other - Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) as to Judge Tamzarian

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/13/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Special Verdict - Special Verdict

2/15/2019: Special Verdict - Special Verdict

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

2/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

Judgment on Special Verdict - Judgment on Special Verdict

3/29/2019: Judgment on Special Verdict - Judgment on Special Verdict

Summons - on Cross Complaint

12/19/2017: Summons - on Cross Complaint

Answer

12/19/2017: Answer

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/5/2017: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/11/2017: Complaint

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/29/2019 ; Status Date changed from 02/15/2019 to 03/29/2019 ; Status changed from Not Entered (pending submission of proposed judgment) to Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketJudgment on Special Verdict; Signed and Filed by: Cesar Reyna (Cross-Complainant); As to: Brenda Lara-Juarez (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment on Special Verdict: Filed By: Cesar Reyna (Cross-Complainant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Cesar Reyna (Cross-Complainant); Total Costs: 9162.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: judgment scheduled for 05/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE3 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: judgment scheduled for 05/28/2019 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/08/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Cesar Reyna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brenda Lara-Juarez (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Reyna (Defendant); Service Date: 11/28/2017; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSummons filed; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketSuleica Cacao-Lara, a minor by and through guardian ad litem Brenda Lara-Juarez; Filed by: Brenda Lara-Juarez (Plaintiff); As to: Suleica Cacao Lara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brenda Lara-Juarez (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Reyna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brenda Lara-Juarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

SARA YOUNG, ESQ., [SBN: 136681] LAW OFFICES OF FRANCINE B. KELLY & ASSOCIATES

13340 183R? STREET, SUITE 110

CERRITOS, CA 90703 S"Perlog,'fLED TELEPHONE: 562.653.2300 Ounty op Tt Of Gy FACSIMILE: 562.653-2309 Los g pg, lfornia

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE - LIMITED [Exceeds $10k]

BRENDA LARA-JUAREZ, CASE NO.: 17STLC00052

Case assigned to Department 77

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR

COMPARATIVE INDEMNITY;

CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

(Filed concurrently with Answer to Complaint)

CESAR REYNA AND DOES 1 - 20, INCLUSIVE,

Defendants.

[Date Complaint Filed: 8/11/2017] CESAR REYNA,

Cross-Complainant, Vs.

BRENDA LARA-JUAREZ AND ROSE 1

THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE,

Cross-Defendants. TO ALL PARTIES AND TO THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD:

COMES NOW the Cross-complainant, CESAR REYNA, and for causes of action against Cross-defendants, BRENDA LARA-JUAREZ AND ROSE 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, and

each of them, complains and alleges as follows: