This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 00:49:08 (UTC).

BREEANA MONCRIEF, ET AL. VS LEYLEMIRLE J FREGOZO HERNANDEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 BREEANA MONCRIEF filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEYLEMIRLE J FREGOZO HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3566

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONCRIEF BREEANA

Defendants

FREGOZO HERNANDEZ LEYLEMIRLE J

VILLAREALRODRIGUEZ VICTOR M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOMMER PAUL ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

9/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF PAUL R. SOMMER IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEM

9/16/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF PAUL R. SOMMER IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEM

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

11/19/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Setting Hearing on Petitioner Breanna Moncrief's ...)

12/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Setting Hearing on Petitioner Breanna Moncrief's ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Hearing on Petitioner Breanna Moncrief's ...) of 12/29/2020

12/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Setting Hearing on Petitioner Breanna Moncrief's ...) of 12/29/2020

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF PAUL R. SOMMER IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITIONER BREANNA MONCRIEF'S EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTIO

2/19/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF PAUL R. SOMMER IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITIONER BREANNA MONCRIEF'S EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTIO

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise) of 02/23/2021

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise) of 02/23/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/01/2020

9/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/01/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Deontre

11/30/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Deontre

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/21/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/6/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Hearing11/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/29/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration OF PAUL R. SOMMER IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) AND IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); Filed by: Breeana Moncrief (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 05/27/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties: Victor M VillarealRodriguez (Defendant), Leylemirle J Fregozo Hernandez (Defendant); Status changed from Filed to Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Deontre; Signed and Filed by: Breeana Moncrief (Plaintiff); As to: Deontre Lutton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Breeana Moncrief (Plaintiff); Deontre Lutton (Plaintiff); As to: Leylemirle J Fregozo Hernandez (Defendant); Victor M VillarealRodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Breeana Moncrief (Plaintiff); Deontre Lutton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC13566    Hearing Date: February 23, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Tue., February 23, 2021 JUDGE/DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Moncrief, et al. v. Hernandez, et al. COMP. FILED: 11-06-18

CASE NUMBER: 18STLC13566 TRIAL DATE: NOT SET

NOTICE: NO PET. FILED: 11-19-20

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF A PENDING ACTION ON BEHALF OF MINOR

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Breeana Moncrief on behalf of minor Claimant Deontre Lutton

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(CCP § 372, CRC, rule 7.950)

TENTATIVE RULING:

The Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: None filed as of February 17, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of February 17, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On November 6, 2019, Plaintiff Breeana Moncrief (“Petitioner”), individually and as guardian ad litem for minor Plaintiff Deontre Lutton (“Claimant”) filed an action for personal injuries and property damage against Defendants Leylemirle J. Fregozo Hernandez and Victor M. Villarealrodriguez (collectively, “Respondents”). Petitioner was appointed as Claimant’s guardian ad litem on November 30, 2018. On November 19, 2020, Petitioner filed the instant Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (the “Petition”) on behalf of Claimant.

On December 29, 2020, the Court noted several defects in the Petition and ordered Petitioner to file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies. (12/29/20 Minute Order.) The Court warned that failure to do so could result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied. (Id.)

To date, no supplemental papers have been filed. Accordingly, the Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, the Petition to Approve Compromise of a Pending Action is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOMMER PAUL R.