This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 18:43:59 (UTC).

BREANA SERVIN VS MACLAY HEALTHCARE, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 BREANA SERVIN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MACLAY HEALTHCARE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5466

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERVIN BREANA

Defendant

MACLAY HEALTHCARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOULD MICHAEL AARON

Defendant Attorney

ALBERT RACHEL ELISE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

2/5/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice (name extension) - and request to withdraw request for entry of default

4/18/2018: Notice (name extension) - and request to withdraw request for entry of default

Answer

6/12/2018: Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/6/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - on Complaint

12/19/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/19/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Breana Servin on 12/19/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Breana Servin as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Breana Servin (Plaintiff); As to: Maclay Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Maclay Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketNotice and request to withdraw request for entry of default; Filed by: Breana Servin (Plaintiff); As to: Maclay Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Breana Servin (Plaintiff); As to: Maclay Healthcare, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 01/15/18; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Breana Servin (Plaintiff); As to: Maclay Healthcare, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Breana Servin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Michael A. Gould, Esq. (SBN 151851) Michael@wageandhourlaw.com

Aarin A. Zeif (SBN 247088) Aarin@wageandhourlaw.com

GOULD & ASSOCIATES

A Professional Law Corporation

17822 E 17th Street, Suite 106

Tustin, California 92780

Telephone: (714) 669-2850

Facsimile: (714) 544-0800

Attorneys for Plaintiff Breana Servin

FILED

Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles

DEC 19 201/

Sherri R. Carter, Executive Offigex/Clerk of Counrt By. » Deputy Judi Lara

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

BREANA SERVIN, individually,

Plaintiff,

MACLAY HEALTHCARE, LLC, and DOES 1 through 25,

Defendants.

caseno: 17STLC05466

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR:

1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE (Labor Code § 1197);

2. FAILURE TO PROVIDE ITEMIZED

STATEMENT TO EMPLOYEE

(Violation of Cal. Labor Code § 226);

) 3. FAILURE TO PAY UPON

) TERMINATION OR QUITTING

) EMPLOYEE (Cal. Labor Code §§ ) 201, 202, 203);

% 4. UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES )

(Violation of Business and Professions Code §17200 et seq.); and

5. FAILURE TO PROVIDE

EMPLOYMENT RECORDS

(violation of California Labor Code § 1198.5).

Limited Civil, Under $10,000 Demand for a Jury Trial