This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 08:04:25 (UTC).

BRE PROPERTIES INC VS LEE, ANNA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2012 BRE PROPERTIES INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEE, ANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1058

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRE PROPERTIES INC

Defendants

PARKER TOMMIE

LEE ANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS

Defendant Attorney

KIM, CAROL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • MANDATORY SETL. CONF. HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JURY INSTRUCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • MSC CONTINUED TO 12/06/12 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • STIPULATION TO HAVE TRIAL COURT CONDUCT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 11/29/12 AT 11:00 A M IN DEPT. 87

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • A/C - ANSWER FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.