This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2019 at 14:33:18 (UTC).

BRE PROPERTIES INC. VS JENKINS, JELANI

Case Summary

On 12/27/2012 BRE PROPERTIES INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JENKINS, JELANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1252

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRE PROPERTIES INC.

Defendants

PITTMAN MALIKA

JENKINS JELANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EVANS, CHRIS

EVANS CHRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT FILED AND SUBMITTED TO THE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT FILED AND SUBMITTED TO THE RESEARCH ATTORNEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF THREE DAY DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF THREE DAY NOTICE AND ORIGINAL AGREEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. WRIT WHOLLY UNSATISFIED AS TO POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • WRIT REJECT LETTER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY REJECTED (LA COUNTY) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.