This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2021 at 00:00:51 (UTC).

BRAYTON PRCELL LLP VS CHRISTINE DUMAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 BRAYTON PRCELL LLP filed an Other lawsuit against CHRISTINE DUMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6918

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAYTON PRCELL LLP

Defendants

SANDERS MARIE

DUMAS CONNIE

DUMAS VELMA

IRVING DOUGLAS

WILLIAMS APRIL

WILLIAMS ROBERT LOUIS

DUMAS HAROLD

DUMAS SYLVESTER

DUMAS CHRISTINE

CAMPER JENNEI

JACKSON DALE

CAMPER JENNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO DAVID ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

FORTUNATI CHRISTOPHER ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF; DISCHARGING PLAINTIFF FROM LIABILITY; AND AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

10/30/2019: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF; DISCHARGING PLAINTIFF FROM LIABILITY; AND AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

Proof of Service by Mail - (Amended)

8/2/2018: Proof of Service by Mail - (Amended)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/5/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/17/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

6/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

5/7/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/9/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/10/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Brayton Prcell LLP on 05/07/2018, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for 07/06/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 07/06/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Order to Release Funds: Filed By: Christine Dumas (Defendant),Dale Jackson (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees scheduled for 04/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/06/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 11/04/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketMotion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF; DISCHARGING PLAINTIFF FROM LIABILITY; AND AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; Filed by: Brayton Prcell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Brayton Prcell LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Marie Sanders (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/13/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brayton Prcell LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Dale Jackson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Brayton Prcell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brayton Prcell LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Christine Dumas (Defendant); Sylvester Dumas (Defendant); Jennei Camper (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brayton Prcell LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC06918    Hearing Date: July 06, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION FOR DISCHARGE OF STAKEHOLDER AND FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES

(CCP §§ 386, 386.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Brayton Purcell, LLP’s Motion for Order Dismissing Plaintiff, Discharging Plaintiff from Liability, and Awarding Attorney Fees and Costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.  

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of July 1, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of July 1, 2020   [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On May 7, 2020, Plaintiff Brayton Purcell, LLP (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint in interpleader against Defendants Christine Dumas, Sylvester Dumas, Jennie Camper, Velma Dumas, Harold Dumas, Connie Dumas, April Williams, Robert Louis Williams, Douglas Irving, Marie Sanders, and Dale Jackson. On June 14, 2018, Defendants Christine Dumas and Dale Jackson filed an Answer. Default was entered against Defendants Sylvester Dumas, Jeannie Camper, Velma Dumas, Harold Dumas, April Williams, and Douglas Irving on July 5, 2018, against Marie Sanders on July 13, 2018, against Connie Dumas on July 27, 2018, and against Robert Louis Williams on August 2, 2018.

On October 30, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Order Dismissing Plaintiff, Discharging Plaintiff from Liability, and Awarding Attorney Fees and Costs (the “Motion”). No opposition was filed.

On April 12, 2020, Defendants filed a Stipulation and Order to Release Funds Held (the “Stipulation”), where the parties agreed that the funds of $5,168.68 on deposit with the Court would be released to Defendants Dale Jackson and Christine Dumas in the care of their attorney. (4/12/20 Stipulation.) The parties also agreed Plaintiff would receive costs of $1,530.15 and reduced attorney’s fees of $750.00 to be deducted from the deposited funds. (Id.) The proposed order pursuant to the Stipulation was signed the same day.

As a result, Plaintiff’s Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

 

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Brayton Purcell, LLP’s Motion for Order Dismissing Plaintiff, Discharging Plaintiff from Liability, and Awarding Attorney Fees and Costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. 

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 18STLC06918    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION FOR DISCHARGE OF STAKEHOLDER AND FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES

(CCP §§ 386, 386.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Brayton Purcell, LLP’s Motion for Order Dismissing Plaintiff, Discharging Plaintiff from Liability, and Awarding Attorney Fees and Costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of July 1, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of July 1, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On May 7, 2020, Plaintiff Brayton Purcell, LLP (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint in interpleader against Defendants Christine Dumas, Sylvester Dumas, Jennie Camper, Velma Dumas, Harold Dumas, Connie Dumas, April Williams, Robert Louis Williams, Douglas Irving, Marie Sanders, and Dale Jackson. On June 14, 2018, Defendants Christine Dumas and Dale Jackson filed an Answer. Default was entered against Defendants Sylvester Dumas, Jeannie Camper, Velma Dumas, Harold Dumas, April Williams, and Douglas Irving on July 5, 2018, against Marie Sanders on July 13, 2018, against Connie Dumas on July 27, 2018, and against Robert Louis Williams on August 2, 2018.

On October 30, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Order Dismissing Plaintiff, Discharging Plaintiff from Liability, and Awarding Attorney Fees and Costs (the “Motion”). No opposition was filed.

On April 12, 2020, Defendants filed a Stipulation and Order to Release Funds Held (the “Stipulation”), where the parties agreed that the funds of $5,168.68 on deposit with the Court would be released to Defendants Dale Jackson and Christine Dumas in the care of their attorney. (4/12/20 Stipulation.) The parties also agreed Plaintiff would receive costs of $1,530.15 and reduced attorney’s fees of $750.00 to be deducted from the deposited funds. (Id.) The proposed order pursuant to the Stipulation was signed the same day.

As a result, Plaintiff’s Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

 

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Brayton Purcell, LLP’s Motion for Order Dismissing Plaintiff, Discharging Plaintiff from Liability, and Awarding Attorney Fees and Costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRAYTON PURCELL LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONADIO, DAVID R.