Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 09:10:22 (UTC).

BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP VS MARK CARTIER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 BRADLEY GMELICH LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARK CARTIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9601

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP

Defendants

CARTIER MARK

NORTH OF TWO ENTERTAINMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GMELICH THOMAS P

CANALE KATHRYN PORTER

BRADLEY BARRY ALAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/16/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/16/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/16/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bradley & Gmelich LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant); Service Date: 11/25/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Bradley & Gmelich LLP (Plaintiff); As to: North of Two Entertainment, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 11/25/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Bradley & Gmelich LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant); North of Two Entertainment, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bradley & Gmelich LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant); North of Two Entertainment, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bradley & Gmelich LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant); North of Two Entertainment, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Bradley & Gmelich LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Cartier (Defendant); North of Two Entertainment, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANALE KATHRYN PORTER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GMELICH THOMAS PATRICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY BARRY ALAN