This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 03:04:21 (UTC).

BRAD GREINER VS CARMEN PICCINI

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 BRAD GREINER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARMEN PICCINI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3070

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREINER BRAD

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant

PICCINI CARMEN

Santa Monica, CA 90402

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/4/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/04/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

[Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

3/28/2018: [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Unknown

3/22/2018: Unknown

(Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

3/7/2018: (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Unknown

2/23/2018: Unknown

(Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

2/9/2018: (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 02/09/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/9/2018: Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 02/09/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

[Notice of Rejection]

4/18/2018: [Notice of Rejection]

Unknown

4/18/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

10/4/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/10/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/10/2017: Unknown

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/19/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

6/19/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Brad Greiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Brad Greiner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 03/22/2018 ; Status Date changed from 10/04/2017 to 03/22/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 03/22/2018 ; Status Date changed from 03/22/2018 to 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 03/22/2018 ; Status Date changed from 03/22/2018 to 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Carmen Piccini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Brad Greiner (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 04/24/2017 to 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Brad Greiner (Plaintiff); As to: Carmen Piccini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012190 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $1.00; Payment: 1.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012190 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Brad Greiner (Plaintiff); As to: Carmen Piccini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less