This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 03:16:15 (UTC).

BOWLIN, MICHAEL VS LANE, SHERI

Case Summary

On 12/01/2015 BOWLIN, MICHAEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LANE, SHERI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4937

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWLIN MICHAEL

Defendant

LANE SHERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTHUR R ANGEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2016
  • MOTION FILED: JGMT DEBTOR EXAMINATION HEARING SET FOR 11/15/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED. MAILED. CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT REJECTED-#11 INCOMPLETE, #12 INCOMPLETE-MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • ABSTRACT REJECTED: COMPLETE DATE, COMPLETE 1-C AND DEBTORS NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • COURT JUDGMENT REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/01/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • OSC SET 12/03/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGEL ARTHUR R. ESQ.