This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2016 at 13:49:17 (UTC).

BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I VS SEIBERTH, LAUREL E

Case Summary

On 03/24/2014 BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I filed an Other lawsuit against SEIBERTH, LAUREL E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4200

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I

Defendants

SEIBERTH LAUREL E

SEIBERTH ZELMA L

BANK OF AMERICA

SORGI SHERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN T TREVILLYAN ATTY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2014
  • STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/ORDER FILED/SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • RECEIVED STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/24/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN T. TREVILLYAN