This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 09:44:25 (UTC).

BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I VS ROBERT G LOZANO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I filed an Other lawsuit against ROBERT G LOZANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2303

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I

Respondents

LOZANO ROBERT G

CARRANZA CYNTHA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TREVILLYAN JONATHAN T.

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/1/2021: Judgment - Judgment OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

2/16/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned) of 02/03/2021

2/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned) of 02/03/2021

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration In Support of Judgment

12/28/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration In Support of Judgment

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration In Support of Petition

12/28/2020: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration In Support of Petition

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Continuance

11/13/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/9/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/3/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/4/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/20/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (name extension) - Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned

7/20/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice OF CONTENTS OF ABANDONED MOBILEHOME AND PROCEEDS OF SALE; Filed by: Boulders At The Ranch I (Petitioner); As to: Robert G Lozano (Respondent); Cyntha M Carranza (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Proposed Judgement scheduled for 03/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: Filed By: Boulders At The Ranch I (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: Status Date changed from 02/15/2021 to 03/01/2021; Result Date changed from 03/01/2021 to 03/01/2021; As To Parties changed from Robert G Lozano (Respondent), Cyntha M Carranza (Respondent) to Cyntha M Carranza (Respondent), Robert G Lozano (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Petitioner Boulders At The Ranch I against Respondent Robert G Lozano and Respondent Cyntha M Carranza on the Petition filed by Boulders At The Ranch I on 07/20/2020 for damages of $5,200.00 for a total of $5,200.00, joint and several.; Other: That the mobilehome described as a 2001 Spring Hill, Decal Number LBD1512, Serial Numbers CAFL108A25859SH12/CAFL108B25859SH12, occupying 40701 Rancho Vista Boulevard Sp 214, Palmdale, California 93551 is hereby declared abandoned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Filed by: Boulders At The Ranch I (Petitioner); As to: Robert G Lozano (Respondent); Cyntha M Carranza (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing of Proposed Judgement scheduled for 03/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned) of 02/03/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned scheduled for 02/03/2021 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 02/03/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Boulders At The Ranch I (Petitioner); As to: Cyntha M Carranza (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Boulders At The Ranch I (Petitioner); As to: Cyntha M Carranza (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketPetition To Declare Mobilehome Abandoned; Filed by: Boulders At The Ranch I (Petitioner); As to: Robert G Lozano (Respondent); Cyntha M Carranza (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Boulders At The Ranch I (Petitioner); As to: Robert G Lozano (Respondent); Cyntha M Carranza (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP02303    Hearing Date: February 03, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., February 3, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Boulders at the Ranch I v. Lozano, et al. PET. FILED: 07-07-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP02303 DEFAULT: 09-04-20

NOTICE: OK

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO DECLARE MOBILEHOME ABANDONED

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Boulders at the Ranch I

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO DECLARE MOBILEHOME ABANDONED

(Civ. Code § 798.61)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Boulders at the Ranch I’s Petition to Declare Mobilehome Abandoned is GRANTED. Judgment against Respondents Robert G. Lozano and Cynthia Carranza to be entered in the amount of $5,200.00 plus costs.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of February 1, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of February 1, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On July 20, 2020, Petitioner Boulders at the Ranch I (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Declare Mobilehome Abandoned (the “Petition”) against Respondents Robert G. Lozano (“Lozano”) and Cynthia M. Carranza (“Carranza”). Pursuant to Civil Code section 798.61, Petitioner seeks a court order deeming Respondents’ mobilehome, described as a 2001 Spring Hill, Decal No. LBD1512, located on Space No. 214 (the “Mobilehome”) at 40701 Rancho Vista Blvd., Palmdale CA 93551 (the “Park”) to be abandoned, and to award Petitioner monthly storage charges and attorney’s fees and costs. (Pet., pp. 1-3.)

At the initial hearing on December 10, 2020, the Court found that Petitioner had satisfied the notice of belief of abandonment requirements of Civil Code section 798.61, subdivision (b), and the Petition and service requirements of Civil Code section 798.61, subdivision (c)(1). (12/10/20 Minute Order.) However, the Court found that Petitioner had not submitted any documentary evidence demonstrating the Mobilehome was abandoned, any documentary evidence regarding the costs and “other applicable charges” sought, or any evidence regarding the amount of attorney’s fees sought as requested in the Petition. (Id.) On December 28, 2020, Petitioner filed two supplemental declarations and a notice of continuance.

To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

  1. Determination of “Abandoned Mobilehome”—Civ. Code § 798.61(a)(1)

Pursuant to Civil Code, section 798.61, subdivision (a)(1), an “‘abandoned mobilehome’ means a mobilehome about which all of the following are true:

(A) It is located in a mobilehome park on a site for which no rent has been paid to the management for the preceding 60 days.

(B) It is unoccupied.

(C) A reasonable person would believe it to be abandoned.

(D) It is not permanently affixed to the land.”

In its supplemental papers, Petitioner submits the declaration of Mary Orr, the property manager for the Park. (12/28/20 Orr Decl., ¶ 2.) Therein, she states that no rent has been paid since July 2019, that the Mobilehome has been unoccupied since at least August 2019, and that the Mobilehome is not permanently affixed to the land. (Id. at ¶¶ 6, 7.)

Based on the foregoing, Petitioner has demonstrated the Mobilehome is abandoned within the meaning of Civil Code section 798.61, subdivision (a)(1).

  1. Charges, Attorney’s Fees, and Costs

Civil Code section 798.61, subdivision (d)(2) states:

“If, at the hearing, the petitioner shows by a preponderance of the evidence that the criteria for an abandoned mobilehome has been satisfied and no party establishes an interest therein at the hearing and tenders all past due rent and other charges, the court shall enter a judgment of abandonment, determine the amount of charges to which the petitioner is entitled, and award attorney's fees and costs to the petitioner.”

Petitioner seeks monthly storage charges of $5,200.00 based on $400.00 per month from August 1, 2019. (Pet., pp. 2-3; 12/28/20 Orr Decl., ¶ 9, Exh. 5.) As evidence, Petitioner submits a copy of a billing statement demonstrating that the monthly rental rate for the Mobilehome was $400.00. (Id.) As for attorney’s fees, Petitioner has chosen to forego them as “collection is virtually impossible.” (12/28/20 Trevillyan Decl., ¶ 6.) Accordingly, the Court awards no attorney’s fees.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Boulders at the Ranch I’s Petition to Declare Mobilehome Abandoned is GRANTED. Judgment against Respondents Robert G. Lozano and Cynthia Carranza to be entered in the amount of $5,200.00 plus costs.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 20STCP02303    Hearing Date: December 10, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., December 10, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Boulders at the Ranch I v. Lozano, et al. PET. FILED: 07-07-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP02303 DEFAULT: 09-04-20

NOTICE: OK

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO DECLARE MOBILEHOME ABANDONED

MOVING PARTY: Petitioner Boulders at the Ranch I

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO DECLARE MOBILEHOME ABANDONED

(Civ. Code § 798.61)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Boulders at the Ranch I’s Petition to Declare Mobilehome Abandoned is CONTINUED TO FEB 3, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of December 8, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of December 8, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On July 20, 2020, Petitioner Boulders at the Ranch I (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Declare Mobilehome Abandoned (the “Petition”) against Respondents Robert G. Lozano (“Lozano”) and Cynthia M. Carranza (“Carranza”). Pursuant to Civil Code section 798.61, Petitioner seeks a court order deeming Respondents’ mobilehome, described as a 2001 Spring Hill, Decal No. LBD1512, located on Space No. 214 (the “Mobilehome”) at 40701 Rancho Vista Blvd., Palmdale CA 93551 (the “Park”) to be abandoned, and to award Petitioner monthly storage charges and attorney’s fees and costs. (Pet., pp. 1-3.)

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

  1. Determination of “Abandoned Mobilehome”—Civ. Code § 798.61(a)(1)

Pursuant to Civil Code, section 798.61, subdivision (a)(1), an “‘abandoned mobilehome’ means a mobilehome about which all of the following are true:

(A) It is located in a mobilehome park on a site for which no rent has been paid to the management for the preceding 60 days.

(B) It is unoccupied.

(C) A reasonable person would believe it to be abandoned.

(D) It is not permanently affixed to the land.”

Petitioner did not provide any evidence, such as a declaration from an on-site manager or copies of past-due rent notices, that demonstrate Respondents’ Mobilehome falls within the definition of “abandoned.” Thus, Petitioner is ordered to submit admissible evidence that demonstrates the Mobilehome is abandoned.

  1. Notice of Belief of Abandonment—Civ. Code § 798.61(b)

Civil Code, section 798.61, subdivision (b) requires:

After determining a mobilehome in a mobilehome park to be an abandoned mobilehome, the management shall post a notice of belief of abandonment on the mobilehome for not less than 30 days, and shall deposit copies of the notice in the United States mail, postage prepaid, addressed to the homeowner at the last known address and to any known registered owner, if different from the homeowner, and to any known holder of a security interest in the abandoned mobilehome. This notice shall be mailed by registered or certified mail with a return receipt requested.”

Petitioner attached a copy of Notice of Belief of Abandonment dated June 15, 2020. (Pet., Exh. 1.) Petitioner attaches a declaration from Christian Trevillyan stating that he posted a copy of the Notice of Belief of Abandonment on the Mobilehome on June 17, 2020 and that same day, mailed via certified mail to Respondents, the only registered owners. (9/3/20 Trevillyan Decls., ¶¶ 2-3, Exhs. 3.) Thus, Petitioner has satisfied section 798.61, subdivision (b).

  1. Petition for Judicial Declaration—Civ. Code § 798.61(c)

Civil Code section 798.61, subdivision (c)(1) states:

“Thirty or more days following posting pursuant to subdivision (b), the management may file a petition in the superior court in the county in which the mobilehome park is located, for a judicial declaration of abandonment of the mobilehome. A proceeding under this subdivision is a limited civil case. Copies of the petition shall be served upon the homeowner, any known registered owner, and any known person having a lien or security interest of record in the mobilehome by posting a copy on the mobilehome and mailing copies to those persons at their last known addresses by registered or certified mail with a return receipt requested in the United States mail, postage prepaid.”

Petitioner filed proofs of service demonstrating Respondents were served with the Petition on July 22, 2020 via certified mail at 29263 Garnet Cyn. Dr., Santa Clarita, CA 91390 and by posting a copy of it on the Mobilehome. (9/30/20 Proofs of Service.) Thus, the service requirements of Civil Code section 798.61, subdivision (c)(1), are satisfied.

  1. Charges, Attorney’s Fees, and Costs

Civil Code section 798.61, subdivision (d)(2) states:

“If, at the hearing, the petitioner shows by a preponderance of the evidence that the criteria for an abandoned mobilehome has been satisfied and no party establishes an interest therein at the hearing and tenders all past due rent and other charges, the court shall enter a judgment of abandonment, determine the amount of charges to which the petitioner is entitled, and award attorney's fees and costs to the petitioner.”

Petitioner seeks monthly storage charges of $400.00 per month from August 1, 2019 and “other applicable charges.” (Pet., pp. 2-3.) However, no documentary evidence or basis is provided for this rate. It is also unclear what other charges Petitioner seeks to recover. Nor is any evidence submitted regarding the amount of attorney’s fees sought, such as a declaration detailing counsel’s hourly rate and time spent on this matter. Thus, Petitioner is ordered to file supplemental papers providing this information.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioner Boulders at the Ranch I’s Petition to Declare Mobilehome Abandoned is CONTINUED TO FEB 3, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers addressing the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to do so may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN T. TREVILLYAN