This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2016 at 05:48:37 (UTC).

BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I VS. JOHNSON, ELYSIA D.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2014 BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON, ELYSIA D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1234

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I

Defendant

JOHNSON ELYSIA D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - JONATHAN T. TREVILLYAN ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/16/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN EXEMPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. A10 , HONORABLE BRIAN C. YEP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/18/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOULDERS AT THE RANCH I is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN T. TREVILLYAN