This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 05:45:32 (UTC).

BOTACH, SHLOMO VS PIERCE JR.,ERIC JEROME

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 BOTACH, SHLOMO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PIERCE JR ,ERIC JEROME. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2030

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOTACH SHLOMO

Defendant

PIERCE JR. ERIC JEROME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MELLER & FLOYD - ERIC MELLER ESQ

Attorney at MELLER & FLOYD

MELLER ERIC ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • WRIT RECEIVED AS TO POSSESSION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 40.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (PIERCE JR.,ERIC JEROME) ON 06/09/17 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 00.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/12/17 . FOR (BOTACH, SHLOMO) . AGAINST (PIERCE JR.,ERIC JEROME) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1226 NORTH LA BREA AVENUE INGLEWOOD, CA 90301 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT/UD; FILED. SERVED AS TO (PIERCE JR.,ERIC JEROME) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (PIERCE JR.,ERIC JEROME) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (PIERCE JR.,ERIC JEROME) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (PIERCE JR.,ERIC JEROME) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. WES FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM505588011. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/01/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . .

    Read MoreRead Less