This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:14:47 (UTC).

BOECKMANN AUTOMOTIVE LLC DBA GALPIN HONDA VS WILLIAM TORRES AKA WILLIAM RUBEN TORRES

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 BOECKMANN AUTOMOTIVE LLC DBA GALPIN HONDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAM TORRES AKA WILLIAM RUBEN TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0322

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOECKMANN AUTOMOTIVE LLC DBA GALPIN HONDA

11151 Laurel Canyon Blvd

Mission Hills, CA 91345

Defendant

TORRES AKA WILLIAM RUBEN TORRES WILLIAM

Pacoima, CA 91331

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/10/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

9/15/2016: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/10/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/10/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/10/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/10/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/10/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Maria Torres-wife

6/24/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Maria Torres-wife

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2016
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0004135 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 08/10/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Boeckmann Automotive llc dba Galpin Honda against Defendant William Torres aka William Ruben Torres on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Boeckmann Automotive llc dba Galpin Honda on 06/06/2016 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $2,580.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive llc dba Galpin Honda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 08/10/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service Maria Torres-wife; Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive llc dba Galpin Honda (Plaintiff); As to: William Torres aka William Ruben Torres (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0000433 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Boeckmann Automotive llc dba Galpin Honda (Plaintiff); As to: William Torres aka William Ruben Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less